Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/31/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/03/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/03/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/03/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/03/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/09/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/15/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/15/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/09/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/13/2006