Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/03/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/03/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/03/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/03/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/03/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/03/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 11/03/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/03/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/03/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/03/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/03/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/03/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/03/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/03/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/04/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/04/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/04/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/04/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/04/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/04/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/04/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/04/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/04/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/04/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/04/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/04/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/04/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/04/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/04/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/07/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/07/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/07/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/07/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/07/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/07/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/07/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/07/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/07/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/09/2006