Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/01/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/01/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/01/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/01/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/01/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/02/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/08/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/09/2005