Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/18/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/18/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 11/18/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/18/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 11/18/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/18/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/18/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/18/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/18/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/18/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/18/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/15/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/15/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/08/2006