Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/17/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/17/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/12/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/12/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/13/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/13/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/14/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/14/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/04/2006