Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/14/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/24/2006