Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/07/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/07/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/14/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/02/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/02/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/13/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/14/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/29/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/03/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/08/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/19/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/26/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew