Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/02/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/02/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/02/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/08/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/15/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/08/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/08/2005