Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/28/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/07/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/13/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/14/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/14/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/14/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/14/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/14/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/14/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/05/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/05/2006