Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/07/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/03/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/17/2006