There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress in support of military recruiting.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/01/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Education Reform.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/01/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/23/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/14/2006Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2006Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2006Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/01/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/01/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/01/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/01/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/01/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/01/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/01/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/01/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/01/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/01/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/09/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/30/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/14/2006 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/23/2006 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce02/14/2006 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness05/01/2006 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Education Reform05/01/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.339.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.339. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2006)

Recognizes: (1) the importance of military recruiting in ensuring national security; and (2) the essential role of U.S. Armed Forces in protecting the nation and providing valuable resources and life experiences for future leaders.

Condemns: (1) municipal and university actions which defy federal statutes regarding military recruiters, including recruiter access provisions; and (2) those who denigrate military service as less significant or valuable than higher education.