Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/01/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/01/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/01/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/01/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/01/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/01/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/01/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/01/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/01/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/01/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/09/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/30/2006