Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/10/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/02/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/02/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/08/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/09/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/16/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/16/2005