Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/28/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/28/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/09/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/04/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/25/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/14/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/26/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/27/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/13/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/13/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/13/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/14/2006