Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/02/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/18/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/24/2006