Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/15/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/15/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/15/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/16/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/16/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/16/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/30/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/04/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/27/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/27/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/27/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/04/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/11/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/11/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2006