Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/02/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/02/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/09/2005