Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/09/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/09/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/09/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/09/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/09/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/09/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/13/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/13/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/13/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/13/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/13/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/13/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/13/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/13/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/14/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/15/2006