Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/16/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/16/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/29/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/25/2006