There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
05/04/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4092)
05/03/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 114).(text: CR H1992)
05/02/2006Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 109-448.
03/16/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
05/05/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/04/2006SenateReceived in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4092)
05/03/2006HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by the Yeas and Nays: 417 - 0.
05/03/2006HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/03/2006-2:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/03/2006-2:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 114). (text: CR H1992)
05/03/2006-2:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2030-2031)
05/03/2006-11:13amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/03/2006-11:10amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 359.
05/03/2006-11:10amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1992)
05/03/2006-11:09amHouseMr. Kuhl (NY) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
05/02/2006HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 170.
05/02/2006HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 109-448.
04/05/2006HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
04/05/2006HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/30/2006HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
03/30/2006HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
03/17/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/16/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/16/2006HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/16/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/16/2006 Referred to
05/03/2006 Markup by
05/02/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-448
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/17/2006 Referred to
03/30/2006 Markup by
03/30/2006 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.Con.Res.359. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (05/04/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the use of the Capitol grounds for the 2006 District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run on June 9, 2006.