Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/06/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/17/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/17/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/17/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/17/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/25/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/25/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/11/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/19/2006