Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/12/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/12/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/12/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/09/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/09/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/14/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/26/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/27/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/11/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/18/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/14/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/14/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/14/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/14/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/14/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/28/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/28/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/28/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/28/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/28/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/28/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/28/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/28/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/28/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/28/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/28/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/28/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/28/2006