Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 04/26/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/26/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/04/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/04/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/11/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/11/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/09/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/22/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/10/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/24/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/14/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/14/2006