Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/24/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/26/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/13/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/27/2006