Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/02/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/24/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/24/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/24/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/24/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/29/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/29/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/29/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/29/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/29/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/08/2006