Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/08/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/08/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/08/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/08/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/19/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/16/2005