Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/17/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/17/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/17/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/17/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/17/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/18/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/18/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/18/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/18/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/18/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/18/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/18/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/18/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/18/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/18/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/18/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/18/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/18/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/18/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/18/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/18/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/18/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/18/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/18/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/18/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/18/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/18/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/18/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/18/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/22/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/22/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/22/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/23/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/23/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/23/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/23/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/23/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/23/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/23/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/23/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/24/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/24/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/24/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/24/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/24/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/24/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/24/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2006