Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/19/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/23/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/23/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/23/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/23/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/23/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/23/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/23/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/07/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/19/2006