Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/09/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/09/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/09/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/09/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/09/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/05/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/05/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/12/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/12/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/14/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/14/2005