Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/07/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/07/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/07/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/07/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/14/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/14/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/21/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/21/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/21/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/12/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/12/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/12/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/18/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/20/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/20/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/28/2006