Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/20/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/22/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/27/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/21/2006