Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/26/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/26/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/26/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/27/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/27/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/10/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/18/2006