Text: H.Con.Res.443 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/2006)


109th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. CON. RES. 443


Honoring Private First Class Kristian Menchaca, Private First Class Thomas L. Tucker, and Specialist David J. Babineau, United States Army, for their sacrifice in June 2006 while serving the United States in Operation Iraqi Freedom.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

June 29, 2006

Mr. Walden of Oregon (for himself, Mr. Whitfield, Mr. Ortiz, Mr. Neugebauer, Mr. Neal of Massachusetts, Mrs. Schmidt, Mr. Chabot, Mrs. Blackburn, Ms. Jackson-Lee of Texas, and Mr. Reyes) submitted the following concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Armed Services


CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

Honoring Private First Class Kristian Menchaca, Private First Class Thomas L. Tucker, and Specialist David J. Babineau, United States Army, for their sacrifice in June 2006 while serving the United States in Operation Iraqi Freedom.

    Whereas on June 16, 2006, three members of the United States Army, Private First Class Kristian Menchaca, Private First Class Thomas L. Tucker, and Specialist David J. Babineau, of B Company, lst Battalion, 502nd Infantry Regiment, 101st Airborne Division (Air Assault), Fort Campbell, Kentucky, were manning a checkpoint in Yusufiya, Iraq, a town regarded as one of the most hostile environments in all of Iraq;

    Whereas during a small arms attack on the checkpoint, Specialist Babineau was killed;

    Whereas when a quick reaction force arrived at the checkpoint, Private First Class Menchaca and Private First Class Tucker could not be found, resulting in their status being listed as “Duty Status Whereabouts Unknown”;

    Whereas the possibility that the two soldiers had been captured reminded all Americans that Sergeant Keith M. (Matt) Maupin, assigned to the 724th Transportation Company, United States Army Reserve, Bartonville, Illinois, was seized as the result of actions of unfriendly military or paramilitary forces on April 9, 2004, and continues to be held captive;

    Whereas Army units and Iraqi police and military forces conducted unrelenting search operations, using every available resource, in attempting to find Private First Class Menchaca and Private First Class Tucker until remains believed to be those of Private First Class Menchaca and Private First Class Tucker were spotted near Yusufiya on June 19, 2006;

    Whereas United States forces could not immediately recover the remains because of numerous bombs that had been hidden on the road leading to their location and in the area of the bodies; and

    Whereas because of the condition of the bodies, those remains could not immediately be conclusively identified as those of Private First Class Menchaca and Private First Class Tucker, but on June 22, 2006, they were determined by the Department of Defense to be those of the two missing soldiers: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That Congress—

(1) recognizes and honors the service, courage, and sacrifice of Private First Class Kristian Menchaca, of Brownsville, Texas, Private First Class Thomas L. Tucker, of Madras, Oregon, and Specialist David J. Babineau, of Springfield, Massachusetts, all of B Company, lst Battalion, 502nd Infantry Regiment, 101st Airborne Division (Air Assault), Fort Campbell, Kentucky, who died in Yusufiya, Iraq, in June 2006;

(2) will never forget the barbaric treatment of Private First Class Menchaca and Private First Class Tucker at the hands of the enemy;

(3) remembers that Sergeant Keith M. (Matt) Maupin, of Batavia, Ohio, continues to be held captive by the enemy;

(4) calls upon every American to pause and pay tribute to these brave soldiers; and

(5) extends its continued sympathies to the families of those who died and its continued support to the family of Sergeant Maupin until his safe return.