Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/20/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/21/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/28/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/28/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/15/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/08/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/08/2006