Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/13/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/14/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/19/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/19/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/20/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/20/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/20/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/20/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/20/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/20/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/25/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/25/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/25/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/25/2006