Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/14/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/14/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/20/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/20/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/20/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/20/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/20/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/20/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/20/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/20/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/20/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/20/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/20/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/20/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/20/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/20/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/20/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/20/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/21/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/21/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/21/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/25/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/27/2006