Text: H.Con.Res.478 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (11/13/2006)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 109th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 478 Referred in Senate (RFS)]

  2d Session
H. CON. RES. 478


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           September 28, 2006

                                Received

                           November 13, 2006

  Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION



   Supporting the goals and ideals of ``Lights On Afterschool!'', a 
             national celebration of after-school programs.

Whereas high-quality after-school programs provide safe, challenging, engaging, 
        and fun learning experiences to help children and youth develop their 
        social, emotional, physical, cultural, and academic skills;
Whereas high-quality after-school programs support working families by ensuring 
        that their children are safe and productive after the regular school day 
        ends;
Whereas high-quality after-school programs build stronger communities by 
        involving the Nation's students, parents, business leaders, and adult 
        volunteers in the lives of the Nation's young people, thereby promoting 
        positive relationships among children, youth, families, and adults;
Whereas high-quality after-school programs engage families, schools, and diverse 
        community partners in advancing the well-being of the Nation's children;
Whereas  ``Lights On Afterschool!'', a national celebration of after-school 
        programs on October 12, 2006, promotes the critical importance of high-
        quality after-school programs in the lives of children, their families, 
        and their communities;
Whereas more than 28,000,000 children in the United States have parents who work 
        outside the home, and 14,300,000 children have no place to go after 
        school; and
Whereas many after-school programs across the Nation are struggling to keep 
        their doors open and their lights on: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That the Congress supports the goals and ideals of  ``Lights On 
Afterschool!'', a national celebration of after-school programs.

            Passed the House of Representatives September 27, 2006.

            Attest:

                                                 KAREN L. HAAS,

                                                                 Clerk.