There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress that public policy should continue to protect and strengthen the ability of farmers and ranchers to join together in cooperative self-help efforts.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/26/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/29/2006Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
09/26/2006Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 09/26/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/26/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/05/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/06/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture09/26/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.482. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/26/2006)

Expresses the sense of Congress that public policy should continue to protect and strengthen the ability of farmers and ranchers to join together in cooperative self-help efforts to: (1) improve their income from the marketplace and their economic well-being; (2) capitalize on new market opportunities; and (3) help meet the food and fiber needs of consumers, provide for increased energy production, promote rural development, maintain and create needed jobs, and contribute to a growing U.S. economy.