Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 09/26/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/26/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/26/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/05/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/06/2006