Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/05/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/28/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/28/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/12/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/12/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/12/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/21/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/25/2005