Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/15/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/07/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/16/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/16/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/16/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/16/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/16/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/16/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/14/2005