Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/21/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/26/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 12/08/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/08/2006