Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/15/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/05/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/06/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/20/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/26/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/26/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/27/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/03/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/16/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/16/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/23/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/22/2005