Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/03/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/03/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/03/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/03/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/03/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/03/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/03/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/03/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 03/03/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/03/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/03/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/03/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/03/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/03/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/03/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/03/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/03/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/03/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/03/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/03/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/03/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/10/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/12/2005