Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/03/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/08/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/08/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/09/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/15/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/15/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/15/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/17/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/06/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/28/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/04/2005