Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/03/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/10/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/14/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/05/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/05/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/12/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/19/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/16/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/18/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/18/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/21/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/02/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/27/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/27/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/13/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/13/2006