Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/09/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/08/2005