Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/09/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/13/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/13/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/13/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/13/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/19/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/26/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/26/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/26/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/26/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/03/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/03/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/10/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/10/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/23/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/23/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/23/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/23/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/23/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/23/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/23/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/23/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/23/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/23/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/23/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/25/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/16/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/20/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/20/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/22/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/30/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/30/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/14/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/14/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/21/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/21/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/26/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/28/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/08/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/27/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/27/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/27/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/15/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/14/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/14/2006