Refine your search

Showing 9 of 9 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
04/28/2005 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 47. Record Vote Number: 114.
04/28/2005 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 214 - 211 (Roll no. 149).
04/28/2005 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
04/28/2005 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 109-62 filed.(text of conference report: CR H2660-2692)
04/27/2005 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
04/04/2005 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Gregg; Domenici; Grassley; Allard; Conrad; Sarbanes; Murray.
04/04/2005 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate in lieu of S. Con. Res. 18 with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/17/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 218 - 214 (Roll no. 88).
03/11/2005 The House Committee on The Budget reported an original measure, H. Rept. 109-17, by Mr. Nussle.