Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/15/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/15/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/14/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/18/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/19/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/21/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/03/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/31/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/31/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/03/2006